This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 03:59:46 (UTC).

CAROLINA PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS L.A. DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 CAROLINA PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against L A DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6697

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTILLO AN INDIVIDUAL CAROLINA

Defendant

L.A. DUPLEXES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARTANYAN NICOLE J.

Defendant Attorney

GRECO VICKI

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/23/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/23/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/23/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/25/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

10/3/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/3/2022: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

4/28/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2025
  • Hearing02/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2023
  • Hearing11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2023
  • Hearing11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: L.A. DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: CAROLINA PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/16/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: L.A. DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: CAROLINA PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: L.A. DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAROLINA PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/23/2022; Service Cost: 114.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAROLINA PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAROLINA PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAROLINA PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: L.A. DUPLEXES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less