This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2022 at 06:12:53 (UTC).

CAROLINA MARQUEZ VS NEXT LEVEL STAFFING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 CAROLINA MARQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NEXT LEVEL STAFFING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9345

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARQUEZ CAROLINA

Defendants

CHILI MOJAVE A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

NEXT LEVEL STAFFING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOJAVE FOODS CORPORATION A MARYLAND CORPORATION

NEXT LEVEL STAFFING 48 A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

KUN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/21/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/2/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/04/2021

10/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/04/2021

Notice of Settlement

10/4/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL

1/27/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Order - Dismissal

1/27/2022: Order - Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL); Filed by Mojave Foods Corporation, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:41 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Carolina Marquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mojave Foods Corporation, a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carolina Marquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carolina Marquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carolina Marquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carolina Marquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carolina Marquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less