This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2021 at 20:15:47 (UTC).

CAROL SORRENTI VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 CAROL SORRENTI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3784

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SORRENTI CAROL

Defendants

PEPPERTREE RANCH MANAGEMENT LLC

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

BORROW JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MESROBIAN KRIKOR

TALAIE ROXANNA

Defendant Attorney

WEINER MARK R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/10/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

PI General Order

4/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

6/8/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2024
  • Hearing04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Peppertree Ranch Management, LLC (Defendant); Jennifer Borow Erroneously Sued As Jennifer Borrow (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Carol Sorrenti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carol Sorrenti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carol Sorrenti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carol Sorrenti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carol Sorrenti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEINER MARK R.