This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2021 at 18:44:38 (UTC).

CAROL ROBERSON VS BIG LOTS STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 CAROL ROBERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIG LOTS STORES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0573

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERSON CAROL

Defendant

BIG LOTS STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOKAEEM JOSHUA J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2024
  • Hearing07/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carol Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carol Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carol Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG LOTS STORES INC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOKAEEM JOSHUA