This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2022 at 05:12:25 (UTC).

CAROL KILINSKY VS ANNA SHIRAZI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 CAROL KILINSKY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANNA SHIRAZI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3633

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KILINSKY CAROL

KILINSKY ERIC

LA MOBILE LABS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TURNKEY CAPITAL SOLUTIONS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AZB LLC

SHIRAZI ANNA

SHIRAZI MUNSIF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLYLE JAQAY LONNIE

Defendant Attorney

IMEL LAWRENCE J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/1/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

7/5/2022: Answer

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/23/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

Answer

2/1/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/20/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/18/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/3/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

1/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

11/15/2021: Cross-Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE J. IMEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF CAROL KILINSKYS COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE J. IMEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF CAROL KILINSKYS COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2024
  • Hearing02/16/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Anna Shirazi (Defendant); Munsif Shirazi (Defendant); AZB, LLC (Defendant); As to: Carol Kilinsky (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Lawrence J. Imel (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketAddress for Lawrence J. Imel (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (5-7 day estimate) scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/16/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Carol Kilinsky (Plaintiff); As to: AZB, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 10/06/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Carol Kilinsky (Plaintiff); As to: Munsif Shirazi (Defendant); Service Date: 10/06/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carol Kilinsky (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Shirazi (Defendant); Munsif Shirazi (Defendant); AZB, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carol Kilinsky (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Shirazi (Defendant); Munsif Shirazi (Defendant); AZB, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carol Kilinsky (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Shirazi (Defendant); Munsif Shirazi (Defendant); AZB, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven J. Kleifield in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLYLE JAQAY LONNIE