This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2023 at 14:04:33 (UTC).

CAROL DUDLEY KATZKA VS PAVILIONS SUPERMARKET, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 CAROL DUDLEY KATZKA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against PAVILIONS SUPERMARKET,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2185

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUDLEY KATZKA CAROL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PAVILIONS SUPERMARKET

RODRIGUEZ PEREZ LETICIA

ALBERTSONS COMPANY INC.

CBRE INC.

WEST HOLLYWOOD RETAIL OWNER INC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

WEST HOLLYWOOD RETAIL OWNER INC

1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE DOES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES COLIN M.

Defendant Attorneys

PIDHAJNY ASHLEY

HERZOG JONATHON JAY

HARWELL LILLIAN

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CINQUEMANI KIRSTEN K.

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/15/2023: Answer

Request for Dismissal

3/13/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/13/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/7/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/24/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

2/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

1/25/2023: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

1/20/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

1/20/2023: Answer

Answer

1/20/2023: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/28/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CBRE, Inc. (Defendant); WEST HOLLYWOOD RETAIL OWNER, INC (Defendant); As to: Carol Dudley Katzka (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Carol Dudley Katzka on 11/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Carol Dudley Katzka as to Leticia Rodriguez Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Albertsons Company, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CBRE, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Carol Dudley Katzka (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carol Dudley Katzka (Plaintiff); As to: Pavilions Supermarket (Defendant); Leticia Rodriguez Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carol Dudley Katzka (Plaintiff); As to: Pavilions Supermarket (Defendant); Leticia Rodriguez Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carol Dudley Katzka (Plaintiff); As to: Pavilions Supermarket (Defendant); Leticia Rodriguez Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less