This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:41:57 (UTC).

CAROL A LEBRECHT ET AL VS AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 CAROL A LEBRECHT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0769

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

LEBRECHT CAROL A.

LEBRECHT WAYNE

Respondents and Defendants

CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES

THRIFTY DRUGS CORPORATION

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA

PFIZER INC

AVON PRODUCTS INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

THRIFTY PAYLESS INC.

HENRY COMPANY LLC

THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY L.P.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

DOES 1-350

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC.

CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

WATERS KRAUS & PAUL

TRACY KYLE RAINE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DENTONS US LLP

BASSI EDLIN HUIE & BLUM LLP

KING & SALDING LLP

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

TUCKER ELLIS LLP

POLSINELLI LLP

MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

CARPENTER ERIN MATTHEW

THOMAS JESSICA JEAN

WEAKLEY HEATHER LYNN

VONGCHANGLOR NICOLE

MCKELVEY MARY THERESE

MARTINEZ REYNOLD M.

FUKUOKA NICOLE R.

HUIE JEREMY DARWIN

GARRATT JUSTIN EDWARD

WEISS LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

Declaration

7/31/2018: Declaration

Opposition

7/31/2018: Opposition

Objection

7/31/2018: Objection

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/31/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Other -

8/2/2018: Other -

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

8/20/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice

10/17/2018: Notice

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/23/2018: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/23/2018: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

10/23/2018: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/23/2018: Separate Statement

Motion for New Trial

11/5/2018: Motion for New Trial

Opposition

11/13/2018: Opposition

Opposition

11/19/2018: Opposition

Opposition

11/19/2018: Opposition

Notice

11/19/2018: Notice

Opposition

11/19/2018: Opposition

Opposition

11/19/2018: Opposition

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Further Continuing Hearing Date on Avon Products, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Avon Products, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Regarding Defendant Jafra Cosmetics International, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by JAFRA COSMETICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (on Jafra Cosmetics International, Inc.'s ex parte application to continue the Trial Date); Filed by JAFRA COSMETICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (of Defendant, Jafra Cosmetics International, Inc., for an Order Continuing Trial, or, in the Alternative, Shortening Time to Hear the Motion (Lebrecht-BC700769)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Jafra Cosmetics...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketObjection DEFENDANT THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, L.P.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketOpposition DEFENDANT THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, L.P.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS R. LANE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, L.P.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer BC700769 DEFENDANT THRIFTY PAYLESS INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, L.P.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carol A. Lebrecht (Plaintiff); Wayne Lebrecht (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THRIFTY DRUGS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES. A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where AVON PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant