This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:39:19 (UTC).

CARMINE RALPH SABATELLA ET AL VS NATALIE TORRES SOLIS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 CARMINE RALPH SABATELLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NATALIE TORRES SOLIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8630

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABATELLA CARMINE RALPH

Defendants

SOLIS NATALIE TORRES

SOLIS REINALDO

SOLIS LORETO

TORRES LUISA

Guardian Ad Litem

SABATELLA MARCIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

SIMON ROBERT T. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

DAMON JENNIFER M

GIBBS PATRICK J. ESQ.

O'YANG CORY ESQ.

THOMPSON COE & O'MEARA LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO NEGLIGENT FURNISHING OF ALCOHOL CAUSE OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF CORY L. O'YANG

5/11/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO NEGLIGENT FURNISHING OF ALCOHOL CAUSE OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF CORY L. O'YANG

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION

5/21/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT NATALIE TORRES SOILS

6/8/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT NATALIE TORRES SOILS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/8/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

6/8/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSIING JURY FEES

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF POSIING JURY FEES

FTRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2 NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMCNT; 3. NEGLIGENT FURNISHING OF ALCOHOL; 4. NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

6/21/2018: FTRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2 NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMCNT; 3. NEGLIGENT FURNISHING OF ALCOHOL; 4. NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION

7/2/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT NATALIE TORRES SOLIS

7/23/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT NATALIE TORRES SOLIS

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/24/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/24/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Unknown

9/17/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Request for Dismissal

9/26/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/26/2018: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

3/7/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney (NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL); Filed by NATALIE TORRES SOLIS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by NATALIE TORRES SOLIS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Robert T. Simon, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by CARMINE RALPH SABATELLA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CARMINE RALPH SABATELLA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8630    Hearing Date: July 07, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CARMINE RALPH SABATELLA, et al.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

NATALIE TORRES SOLIS, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: ****8630 

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

July 7, 2020

Claimant Gianna Sabatella (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Marcie Sabatella (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendants Natalie Torres Solis and Luisa Torres in exchange for $25,000 $150.00 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $24,850.00 for Claimant to be invested in a single-premium deferred annuity, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim.  (Probate Code ;; 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. ; 372.)  The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable.  Further, the requested attorney’s fees are waived, which the Court finds is fair and reasonable.

However, Item 10 is incomplete, as are Items 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 23Also, there is a charge of $100 for “administrative fees” which is unspecified and the terms and conditions of the annuity in Attachment 19(b)(3) reflects a quote with a purchase date of April 18, 2020.  As this matter is being heard in July 7, 2020, there is no indication that this quote is still valid at the time of hearing.  

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance.  The Court excuses Petitioner and Claimant’s appearances. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 7th day of July 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. 

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON ROBERT TERRENCE