This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 11:30:23 (UTC).

CARMEN SALCIDO VS TSG - THE SHARMA GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 CARMEN SALCIDO filed an Other lawsuit against TSG - THE SHARMA GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GLORIA WHITE-BROWN and JAMES R. DUNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0500

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

JAMES R. DUNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALCIDO CARMEN

Defendant

TSG - THE SHARMA GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZLICH ALLAN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

OSHER JEREMY J.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE, ETC.

10/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE, ETC.

Notice - NOTICE CORRECTED NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE, ETC.

10/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE CORRECTED NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE, ETC.

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/22/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/18/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/25/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

9/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/3/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/3/2020: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • Hearing04/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance, etc.); Filed by Carmen Salcido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (CORRECTED NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE, ETC.); Filed by Carmen Salcido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by Carmen Salcido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department STL-C, James R. Dunn, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge James R. Dunn) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TSG - THE SHARMA GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Carmen Salcido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE); Filed by Carmen Salcido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TSG - THE SHARMA GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carmen Salcido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carmen Salcido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carmen Salcido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZLICH ALLAN