This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 01:37:49 (UTC).

CARMEN SALCIDO VS STATEWIDE FUNDING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 CARMEN SALCIDO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATEWIDE FUNDING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0404

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALCIDO CARMEN

Defendant

STATEWIDE FUNDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZLICH ALLAN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

10/4/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • Hearing10/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CARMEN SALCIDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CARMEN SALCIDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CARMEN SALCIDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CARMEN SALCIDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATEWIDE FUNDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FKA AND DBA CORUM FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. DBA STATEWIDE LENDING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZLICH ALLAN