This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 10:44:54 (UTC).

CARMEN PADRON VS AHMC HEALTHCARE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 CARMEN PADRON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4347

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PADRON CARMEN

Defendants and Respondents

AHMC HEALTHCARE INC

PAK SHANE M.D.

DOES 1 TO 30

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

PACIFIC ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICAL GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ALLEN BRIAN VAN

SILVER DAVID SAMUEL

VAN ALLEN BRIAN SCOTT ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WEND CHRISTOPHER P. ESQ.

PACKER ROBERT B. ESQ.

HABER BROOKE WEISS

WEND CHRISTOPHER P JR.

PACKER ROBERT BRUCE

 

Court Documents

Notice

11/19/2018: Notice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/10/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Order

2/8/2019: Order

Minute Order

2/8/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/13/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

2/15/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/19/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

NOTICE OF AND MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS SHANE PAK, M.D. AND PACIFIC ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF BROOK

6/5/2018: NOTICE OF AND MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS SHANE PAK, M.D. AND PACIFIC ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF BROOK

PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE PROFERRED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC

8/7/2018: PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE PROFERRED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER TAYLOR M.D., M.B.A. IN SUPPORT OF THE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY SHANE PAK M.D. AND PACIFIC ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

8/7/2018: DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER TAYLOR M.D., M.B.A. IN SUPPORT OF THE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY SHANE PAK M.D. AND PACIFIC ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/3/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND THAT DEFENSE OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS BE TRIED SEPARATELY (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 597.5)

5/3/2017: DEMAND THAT DEFENSE OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS BE TRIED SEPARATELY (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 597.5)

Unknown

5/15/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/15/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Mental Examination of Plaintiff) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Mental Examination of Plaintiff) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order continuing the trial date to October 22, 2019 from the currently set trial date) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carmen Padron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Carmen Padron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carmen Padron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carmen Padron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Carmen Padron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC654347    Hearing Date: March 05, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Bryan Van Allen

Bryan Van Allen seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for plaintiff Carmen Padron (“Plaintiff”). Counsel states that there has been a complete breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. The Court notes that trial in this matter is currently set for April 10, 2020. If Plaintiff believes she needs additional time before trial to retain new counsel, she is to file an ex parte application immediately. Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon filing a proof of service showing service of the order on Plaintiff and all parties who have appeared.

Counsel is to file a new proposed order (MC-053) with Item 6 completed.

Mariam Danielyan

Mariam Danielyan seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for plaintiff Carmen Padron (“Plaintiff”). Counsel states that there has been a complete breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. If Plaintiff believes she needs additional time before trial to retain new counsel, she is to file an ex parte application immediately. Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon filing a proof of service showing service of this Order on Plaintiff and all parties who have appeared.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.