This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 13:39:53 (UTC).

CARMEN ORSI VS POWER BROKER INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 CARMEN ORSI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against POWER BROKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0089

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORSI CARMEN

Defendants

POWER BROKER INTERNATIONAL INC.

ARBID CHRISTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN STAN

Defendant Attorney

BOJIC PAUL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/8/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE SET ASIDE

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE SET ASIDE

Answer

3/5/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER 664.6 REVISED

3/23/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER 664.6 REVISED

Case Management Statement

11/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Notice of Ruling

9/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

8/3/2020: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Proof of Service by Mail

8/3/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/9/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Ruling

7/9/2020: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

7/1/2020: Case Management Statement

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference (ReSettlement Status) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (664.6 revised); Filed by Carmen Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Power Broker International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (set aside); Filed by Carmen Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Carmen Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Christian Arbid (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docketat 11:23 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause and Case Managemen...) of 04/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause and Case Managemen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Carmen Orsi (Plaintiff); Carmen Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on First Amended Complaint); Filed by Carmen Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carmen Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carmen Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant