This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2022 at 17:00:49 (UTC).

CARMEN JOHN PERRI VS WESTERN & VENICE SC, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 CARMEN JOHN PERRI filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WESTERN VENICE SC, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1029

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRI CARMEN JOHN

Defendant

WESTERN & VENICE SC LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JR. JOSEPH R.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/1/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • Hearing10/10/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carmen John Perri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carmen John Perri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carmen John Perri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manning, Jr, Joseph R