This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 05:22:40 (UTC).

CARMEN IMAICELA VS BERGER INC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 CARMEN IMAICELA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BERGER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7710

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

IMAICELA CARMEN

Defendants and Respondents

ACCREDITED HOME CARE

BERGER INC

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PELLETIER FRANKLIN D. ESQ.

ENCINO LAW FIRM

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BLANK ROME LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/6/2017: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

7/6/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

SUMMONS

7/6/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/17/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

7/17/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8/17/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/17/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT BERGER, INC. DBA ACCREDITED HOME CARE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/30/2017: DEFENDANT BERGER, INC. DBA ACCREDITED HOME CARE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

JOINT STIPULATION EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 15 DAYS

9/5/2017: JOINT STIPULATION EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 15 DAYS

Minute Order

9/6/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/18/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/20/2017: Unknown

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • at 08:31 am in Department 40, David Sotelo, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Receipt (JURY FEE DEPOSIT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO FIRST, SECOND, THIRD, FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 40, David Sotelo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE: PROOF OF SERVICE;) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 15 DAYS ); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Answer to Complaint (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Notice (OF OSC HEARING ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCREDITED HOME CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where BERGER INC. DBA ACCREDITED NURSING CARE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELLETIER FRANKLIN D. ESQ.