This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2021 at 01:41:25 (UTC).

CARMEN GONZALEZ VS LA AMAPOLA, INC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 CARMEN GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LA AMAPOLA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0636

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ CARMEN

Defendant

LA AMAPOLA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAAVEDRA WALTER P.

Defendant Attorney

KINLEY MATTHEW L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE HEARING SE...)

12/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE HEARING SE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFE...)

10/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFE...) OF 10/19/2020

10/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFE...) OF 10/19/2020

Notice of Ruling

3/17/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

2/26/2020: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Case Management Statement

2/7/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

11/5/2019: Case Management Statement

General Denial

9/26/2019: General Denial

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/8/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/8/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

8/8/2019: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action); Filed by CARMEN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Non-Jury Trial ((est. 3-7 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docketat 11:06 AM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order REGARDING ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE HEARING SE...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docketat 10:39 AM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order ADVANCING AND VACATING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFE...) of 10/19/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order ADVANCING AND VACATING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFE...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by CARMEN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CARMEN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by LA AMAPOLA, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CARMEN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CARMEN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CARMEN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CARMEN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA AMAPOLA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAAVEDRA WALTER P.