This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2023 at 07:24:54 (UTC).

CARMALETA SANDERS, ET AL. VS ALINA GOODNIGHT

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 CARMALETA SANDERS, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALINA GOODNIGHT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0138

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDERS CARMALETA

ROBINSON CORVETTE

Defendant

GOODNIGHT ALINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINGSTON PAUL ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/28/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/28/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

PI General Order

6/10/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

5/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

12/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Carmaleta Sanders (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 11/14/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal NOT Entered, Waived Fees not Paid: Name Extension: NOT Entered, Waived Fees not Paid; As To Parties changed from Carmaleta Sanders (Plaintiff) to Carmaleta Sanders (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2749210 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Carmaleta Sanders, et al. on 05/28/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Carmaleta Sanders

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Carmaleta Sanders (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Corvette Robinson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carmaleta Sanders (Plaintiff); Corvette Robinson (Plaintiff); As to: Alina Goodnight (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carmaleta Sanders (Plaintiff); Corvette Robinson (Plaintiff); As to: Alina Goodnight (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Carmaleta Sanders (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Corvette Robinson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less