This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 21:38:04 (UTC).

CARLSON, JAMES, SR - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 CARLSON, JAMES, SR - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4801

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARLSON JAMES JR

Decedents

CARLSON JAMES JOHN SR

CARLSON JAMES SR

Not Classified By Court

BJORKLUND ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEVENTHAL JONATHAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

5/17/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

5/17/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Notice - Hearing

5/24/2021: Notice - Hearing

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

6/29/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Hearing

6/18/2021: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

6/17/2021: Minute Order

Will Deposited - 11 pgs - Dated - 05/27/2017

7/6/2021: Will Deposited - 11 pgs - Dated - 05/27/2017

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

9/23/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

10/15/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

10/15/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Minute Order

9/23/2021: Minute Order

Letters (Initial)

10/29/2021: Letters (Initial)

Will - Admitted

9/23/2021: Will - Admitted

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (The Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) filed on 5/17/2021 by James Carlson, Jr )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVENTHAL JONATHAN DAVID