This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2022 at 13:47:59 (UTC).

CARLOS VAZQUEZ VS VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 CARLOS VAZQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0885

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAZQUEZ CARLOS

Defendant

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA DBA VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JACE H.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/25/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • Hearing05/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Carlos Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JACE H. ESQ.