This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 14:05:18 (UTC).

CARLOS ROSALES VS INOCENTE AGUILAR-GARCIA

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 CARLOS ROSALES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INOCENTE AGUILAR-GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1442

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALES CARLOS

Defendant

AGUILAR-GARCIA INOCENTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSTOIA ADINA A.

Defendant Attorney

BAHARVAR GABRIELLA

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/11/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/11/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

11/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

11/30/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/28/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Hearing04/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Hearing04/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Inocente Aguilar-Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Inocente Aguilar-Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Inocente Aguilar-Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAHARVAR GABRIELLA