Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 20:55:06 (UTC).

CARLOS RODRIGUEZ VS W HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 CARLOS RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against W HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4239

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ CARLOS

Defendants

W HOTEL MANAGEMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

KOWALESKI COURTNEY

EBERWINE MARK

W HOLLYWOOD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SHERATON OPERATING CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAH PARTH NILAM

Defendant Attorney

PETERSON LEAH ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT AMENDED NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

5/18/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT AMENDED NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/28/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

5/11/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 05/11/2021

5/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 05/11/2021

Answer

5/13/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

5/14/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • Hearing08/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (AMENDED NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT); Filed by W Hotel Management, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant); Marriott International, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant); Sheraton Operating Corporation (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by W Hotel Management, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant); Marriott International, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant); Sheraton Operating Corporation (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by W Hotel Management, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant); Marriott International, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant); Sheraton Operating Corporation (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 05/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W HOTEL MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHERATON OPERATING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAH PARTH NILAM