This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 11:17:41 (UTC).

CARLOS RODRIGUEZ VS 22125 ROSCOE CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 CARLOS RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against 22125 ROSCOE CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THERESA M. TRABER and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6474

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THERESA M. TRABER

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ CARLOS

Defendants

22125 ROSCOE CORP.

HEVER LEERON

QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION

WONG LETICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAND-LEWIS SUZANNE E.

RAND-LEWIS SUZANNE ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARDSON LYNE A.

RICHARDSON LYNE ANN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

1/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/12/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/4/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

1/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...)

10/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...) OF 10/07/2021

10/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...) OF 10/07/2021

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/7/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 22125 ROSCOE CORP. (Defendant); QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION (Defendant); LETICIA WONG (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 22125 ROSCOE CORP. (Defendant); QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION (Defendant); LETICIA WONG (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 22125 ROSCOE CORP. (Defendant); QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION (Defendant); LETICIA WONG (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CARLOS RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CARLOS RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by CARLOS RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...) of 10/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CARLOS RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CARLOS RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CARLOS RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where 22125 ROSCOE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAND-LEWIS SUZANNE ELIZABETH