Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 20:55:59 (UTC).

CARLOS PEREZ VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 CARLOS PEREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6414

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ CARLOS

Defendants

AUTONATION CHEVROLET VALENCIA

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDZANT BARRY L.

Defendant Attorneys

SHUGART JONATHAN M

KOLAR ELIZABETH L

ARENS MCBRIDE MARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

5/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Demand for Jury Trial

4/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Autonation Chevrolet Valencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Autonation Chevrolet Valencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Autonation Chevrolet Valencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Autonation Chevrolet Valencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTONATION CHEVROLET VALENCIA is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUGART JONATHAN M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOLAR ELIZABETH L. ESQ.