This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 14:58:38 (UTC).

CARLOS PEREZ, ET AL. VS JOSE ALVARADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 CARLOS PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ALVARADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4317

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOMEZ NANCY

MENJIVAR CHRISTINA

PEREZ CARLOS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALVARADO JOSE

GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

PEREZ CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARIAN ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

MACKEY ROBERT T.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/3/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/3/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/3/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/3/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/3/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

7/6/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/6/2022: Cross-Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2025
  • Hearing01/30/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • Hearing08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • Hearing07/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose Alvarado (Defendant); Great Century Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Jose Alvarado (Defendant); Great Century Systems, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Perez (Plaintiff); Christina Menjivar (Plaintiff); Nancy Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Perez (Plaintiff); Christina Menjivar (Plaintiff); Nancy Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Perez (Plaintiff); Christina Menjivar (Plaintiff); Nancy Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARIAN, ALEXANDER M