Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 06:49:20 (UTC).

CARLOS OCHOA-PINTO, ET AL. VS RYAN JEFFERY BALSZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 CARLOS OCHOA-PINTO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RYAN JEFFERY BALSZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9796

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OCHOA-PINTO CARLOS

OCHOA TRISTAN

Defendants

BALSZ RYAN JEFFERY

CITY OF COVINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IWUCHUKU DON

IWUCHUKU DONALD

OGIKE METU C.

BARMAKSZIAN ROSIE

Defendant Attorney

GOKOOO ROBERT J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

10/15/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/15/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

12/2/2019: Association of Attorney

Answer

2/18/2020: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/5/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Ruling

8/7/2020: Notice of Ruling

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR TRISTAN

8/23/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR TRISTAN

PI General Order

4/8/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/21/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • Hearing03/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Carlos Ochoa-Pinto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by City of Covina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of Covina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ryan Jeffery Balsz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Carlos Ochoa-Pinto (Plaintiff); Tristan Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Covina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by City of Covina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Ochoa-Pinto (Plaintiff); Tristan Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Tristan); Filed by Tristan Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Ochoa-Pinto (Plaintiff); Tristan Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Ochoa-Pinto (Plaintiff); Tristan Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF COVINA is a litigant