This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 01:32:17 (UTC).

CARLOS MENDOZA VS F.D.S. MANUFACTURING COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 CARLOS MENDOZA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against F D S MANUFACTURING COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUCE G. IWASAKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1520

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRUCE G. IWASAKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA CARLOS

Defendants

F.D.S. MANUFACTURING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STEVENSON ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/26/2023

4/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/26/2023

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION WITH HON. MICHAEL A. LATIN (RET.) AND TO STAY ACTION BEFORE THIS COURT

4/26/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION WITH HON. MICHAEL A. LATIN (RET.) AND TO STAY ACTION BEFORE THIS COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION WITH HON. MICHAEL A. LATIN (RET.) AND TO STAY ACTION BEFORE THIS COURT

4/26/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION WITH HON. MICHAEL A. LATIN (RET.) AND TO STAY ACTION BEFORE THIS COURT

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/22/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/22/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/24/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/24/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/24/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/24/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/24/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN MICHITSCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN MICHITSCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT ROBERT STEVENSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT ROBERT STEVENSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/31/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration of Mailing

1/31/2023: Declaration of Mailing

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/26/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION WITH HON. MICHAEL A. LATIN (RET.) AND TO STAY ACTION BEFORE THIS COURT; Signed and Filed by: Carlos Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Plaintiff); F.D.S. Manufacturing Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Robert Stevenson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/26/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketNotice Defendants' Second Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: F.D.S. Manufacturing Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Robert Stevenson (Defendant); As to: Carlos Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carlos Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: F.D.S. Manufacturing Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Robert Stevenson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carlos Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: F.D.S. Manufacturing Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Robert Stevenson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carlos Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: F.D.S. Manufacturing Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Robert Stevenson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bruce G. Iwasaki in Department 58 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less