This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 04:03:25 (UTC).

CARLOS MENDIZABAL VS MASTEK INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 CARLOS MENDIZABAL filed an Other lawsuit against MASTEK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4733

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MENDIZABAL CARLOS

Defendants and Respondents

SOTO< MIGUEL ANGEL

MASTEK INC

DOES 1 TO 10

SOTO PATRICIA

LE MINH

SOTO MIGUEL ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOLMES MARK D.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE LAW OFFICES OF

MNATZAGANIAN IVAN

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL, TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/13/2018: OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL, TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

MASTEK, INC., MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, PATRICIA SOTO AND MINH LE'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

3/16/2018: MASTEK, INC., MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, PATRICIA SOTO AND MINH LE'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO'S, PATRICIA SOTO'S, AND MINH LE'S JOINT AND SEVERAL DEMURRER ETC.

3/27/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO'S, PATRICIA SOTO'S, AND MINH LE'S JOINT AND SEVERAL DEMURRER ETC.

MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, PATRICIA SOTO AND MINH LE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT; ETC.

5/29/2018: MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, PATRICIA SOTO AND MINH LE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT; ETC.

NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO'S, PATRICIA SOTO'S, AND MINH LE'S JOINT AND SEVERAL DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO'S, PATRICIA SOTO'S, AND MINH LE'S JOINT AND SEVERAL DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL''S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE; DECLARATION OF MARK D. HOLMES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

7/5/2018: PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL''S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE; DECLARATION OF MARK D. HOLMES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY MIGUEL SOTO TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES - SET ONE AND FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF MARK D. HOLMES IN SUPPORT T

7/10/2018: PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY MIGUEL SOTO TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES - SET ONE AND FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF MARK D. HOLMES IN SUPPORT T

PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT AS FILED

7/10/2018: PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT AS FILED

PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY MIGUEL SOTO TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - SET TWO, AND FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF MARK D. HOLMES IN SUP

7/10/2018: PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY MIGUEL SOTO TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - SET TWO, AND FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF MARK D. HOLMES IN SUP

Minute Order

7/17/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY MASTEK, INC. TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - SET ONE, AND FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.

8/24/2018: PLAINTIFF, CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY MASTEK, INC. TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - SET ONE, AND FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.

Request for Refund / Order

9/27/2018: Request for Refund / Order

Stipulation and Order

11/27/2018: Stipulation and Order

MASTEK, INC., MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, PATRICIA SOTO AND MINH LE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/12/2018: MASTEK, INC., MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, PATRICIA SOTO AND MINH LE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO'S, PATRICIA SOTO'S, AND MINH LE'S JOINT AND SEVERAL DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;ETC.

1/12/2018: DEFENDANTS MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO'S, PATRICIA SOTO'S, AND MINH LE'S JOINT AND SEVERAL DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF CARLOS MENDIZABAL'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;ETC.

MASTEK, INC., MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, PATRICIA SOTO AND MINH LE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION O

1/12/2018: MASTEK, INC., MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, PATRICIA SOTO AND MINH LE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION O

DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BARBARA CIOLINO; AND DECLARATION OF MINH LE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/30/2017: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BARBARA CIOLINO; AND DECLARATION OF MINH LE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8/1/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (for Court to maintain jurisdiction over settled matter pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6); Filed by Carlos Mendizabal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal) of 11/09/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 57; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Request for Refund / Order; Filed by Minh Le (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (MOTION - COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (MOTION - COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
154 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carlos Mendizabal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carlos Mendizabal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carlos Mendizabal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Carlos Mendizabal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Originai

LAW OFFICES OF MARK D. HOLMES, APC

m e e, MARK D. HOLMES (SBN 156660} CFiieo 2875 Michelle Drive, Suite 160 | S our e Irvine CA, California 92606 Telephone: (949) 645-0450 072 15 72317 Facsimile: (949) 645-0451 -

Email: mark@mdholmeslaw.com Sh

errifiCarte.’. Exgeutive Diticor/Cierk

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY

CARLOS MENDIZABAL, an individual, Case No.: BC664733 BY FAX Dept. 46 Plaintiff, Judge: Hon. Frederick C. Shaller VS.

FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED

COMPLAINT FOR: MASTEK, INC., a California corporation; - 1) Breach of Contract MIGUEL ANGEL SOTO, an individual, 2) Breach of Contract — Bad Faith PATRICIA SOTO, an individual: MINH LE, an 3) Breach of Fiduciary Duty individual; and DOES 1-10 inclusive, 4) Fraud 5) Conversion Defendants. 6) Trespass to Chattels 7) Violation of Bus. Prof. Code

JURY TRIAL REQUESTED UNLIMITED CIVIL JURISDICTION

(Damages Demand Exceeds $25,000)