Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 02:09:27 (UTC).

CARLOS ISLAS VS LAURA CARDENAS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 CARLOS ISLAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAURA CARDENAS SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7292

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISLAS CARLOS

Defendants

SANCHEZ LAURA CARDENAS

LUCHI LUCINELAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATEVOSIAN VAHAG

Defendant Attorney

YUN CHARLES C.

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) (AGAINST JUDGE MICHAEL E. WHITAKER)

2/11/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) (AGAINST JUDGE MICHAEL E. WHITAKER)

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE 170.6 FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT) OF 02/11/2021

2/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE 170.6 FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT) OF 02/11/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE 170.6 FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT)

2/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE 170.6 FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT)

Answer

2/11/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/14/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

10/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

10/19/2020: PI General Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/27/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Carlos Islas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 11:06 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re 170.6 filed by Counsel for Defendant)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re 170.6 filed by Counsel for Defendant) of 02/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) ((against Judge Michael E. Whitaker)); Filed by Lucinelas Luchi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lucinelas Luchi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Islas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Carlos Islas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Carlos Islas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Islas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Islas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Islas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Islas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less