This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2021 at 01:09:44 (UTC).

CARLOS HERNANDEZ VS SPACE-LOK, INC

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 CARLOS HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SPACE-LOK, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1469

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ CARLOS

Defendant

SPACE-LOK INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHRAIBATI MALEK H.

Defendant Attorney

CARRIGAN JOHN R. JR.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

10/14/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

6/29/2021: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/26/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/1/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Space-Lok, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Space-Lok, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendant Space-Lok, Inc.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPACE-LOK INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRIGAN JOHN R.