This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2021 at 07:02:48 (UTC).

CARLOS HERNANDEZ VS QIANG ZHENG JIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 CARLOS HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QIANG ZHENG JIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4212

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ CARLOS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

UTL TRUCKING LAX LLC

ZHENG JIAN QIANG

COSCO SHIPPING TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

COSCO SHIPPING TERMINALS NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZADOURIAN ARMEN

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MILLER WEYD-ANNE

BERENY JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/21/2020: Answer

Answer

9/15/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/15/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/1/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

6/26/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

6/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/29/2020: PI General Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Hearing12/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by UTL Trucking (LAX) LLC (Cross-Defendant); Qiang Zheng Jian (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by COSCO Shipping Terminals (North America) Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by COSCO Shipping Terminals (North America) Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Qiang Zheng Jian (Defendant); UTL Trucking (LAX) LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less