This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 03:16:31 (UTC).

CARLOS GUERRERO, ET AL. VS SHLOMO RECHNITZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 CARLOS GUERRERO, filed an Other lawsuit against SHLOMO RECHNITZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD J. BURDGE JR. and GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8665

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD J. BURDGE JR.

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAIER MAGDALENA

DORADO BERTA

GUERRERO CARLOS

GUERRERO JOSE

GUERRERO MARTHA

GUERRERO RICHARD ABRAHAM

IVEY ELVIRA

MCWHORTER MARIA

Defendants

BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE AND WELLNESS CENTRE LLC

RECHNITZ SHLOMO

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

STROLL STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN M.

Defendant Attorney

COWDREY SEAN D.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

11/3/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Dismissal

10/5/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

10/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELANIE J. ELY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELANIE J. ELY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

9/29/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/29/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

9/29/2022: Separate Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

9/29/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Continuance

9/22/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/22/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/13/2022

9/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/13/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - Dismissal

9/8/2022: Order - Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT STEVEN STROLL (SPECIALLY APPEARING) TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

9/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT STEVEN STROLL (SPECIALLY APPEARING) TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/16/2022

8/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/16/2022

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

3/9/2022: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant); Rockport Administrative Services, LLC (Defendant); As to: Carlos Guerrero (Plaintiff); Jose Guerrero (Plaintiff); Martha Guerrero (Plaintiff) et al. Total Costs: 2175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (15 days) scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Carlos Guerrero, et al. on 08/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Carlos Guerrero, Jose Guerrero, Martha Guerrero, Richard Abraham Guerrero, Elvira Ivey, Berta Dorado, Maria Mcwhorter, and Magdalena Baier as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Carlos Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Lodging of Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement: Name Extension changed from OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT to of Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Melanie J. Ely in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment: Name Extension changed from OF MELANIE J. ELY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT to of Melanie J. Ely in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Separate Statement: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Summary Judgment: As To Parties changed from Carlos Guerrero (Plaintiff), Martha Guerrero (Plaintiff), Magdalena Baier (Plaintiff), Maria Mcwhorter (Plaintiff), Elvira Ivey (Plaintiff), Jose Guerrero (Plaintiff), Berta Dorado (Plaintiff), Richard Abraham Guerrero (Plaintiff) to Martha Guerrero (Plaintiff), Richard Abraham Guerrero (Plaintiff), Berta Dorado (Plaintiff), Magdalena Baier (Plaintiff), Carlos Guerrero (Plaintiff), Maria Mcwhorter (Plaintiff), Jose Guerrero (Plaintiff), Elvira Ivey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 37 - Hon. Richard J. Burdge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase numbers 21STCV21734, 21STCV28665 are related; case number 21STCV21734 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 08/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/10/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.300 (Department 37 has the oldest case): Status Date changed from 08/04/2021 to 08/04/2021; Name Extension changed from NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.300 to NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.300 (Department 37 has the oldest case); As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carlos Guerrero (Plaintiff); Jose Guerrero (Plaintiff); Martha Guerrero (Plaintiff); Richard Abraham Guerrero (Plaintiff); Elvira Ivey (Plaintiff); Berta Dorado (Plaintiff); Maria Mcwhorter (Plaintiff); Magdalena Baier (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant); Steven Stroll (Defendant); Bakersfield Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carlos Guerrero (Plaintiff); Jose Guerrero (Plaintiff); Martha Guerrero (Plaintiff); Richard Abraham Guerrero (Plaintiff); Elvira Ivey (Plaintiff); Berta Dorado (Plaintiff); Maria Mcwhorter (Plaintiff); Magdalena Baier (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant); Steven Stroll (Defendant); Bakersfield Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carlos Guerrero (Plaintiff); Jose Guerrero (Plaintiff); Martha Guerrero (Plaintiff); Richard Abraham Guerrero (Plaintiff); Elvira Ivey (Plaintiff); Berta Dorado (Plaintiff); Maria Mcwhorter (Plaintiff); Magdalena Baier (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant); Steven Stroll (Defendant); Bakersfield Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less