This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 17:54:10 (UTC).

CARLOS GARNICA VS NH MANAGEMENT LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2018 CARLOS GARNICA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NH MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, THOMAS D. LONG, HOLLY E. KENDIG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9617

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

THOMAS D. LONG

HOLLY E. KENDIG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GARNICA CARLOS

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MOSS & COMPANY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

MICHAEL A. ENTIN TRUST

DOES 1 TO 60

J.G. BEST PAINT INC.

REYNOSA CYNTHIA

NH MANAGEMENT LLC

ENTIN MICHAEL A.

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

J.G. BEST PAINT INC.

BENY YOUR PLUMBER. INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

ARDALAN & ASSOCIATES PLC

ARDALAN PEZHMAN CHRISTOPHER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PEARL NORMAN L

TETZLAFF DAVID WAYNE

GARBER LEONARD N.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

GARBER LEONARD N.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOFS ...)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOFS ...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

8/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/9/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 03/12/2020

3/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 03/12/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...) OF 04/29/2020

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...) OF 04/29/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

4/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMI...)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMI...)

Order - Dismissal

11/9/2020: Order - Dismissal

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE INVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A HEARING ON SHORTENED TIME ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE INVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/11/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE INVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A HEARING ON SHORTENED TIME ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET ASIDE INVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE INVOLUNTARY DISM...)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE INVOLUNTARY DISM...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Ruling

9/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Carlos Garnica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Proofs of Service as to Defendants Michael A. Entin, Michael A. Entin Trust, & Cynthia Reynosa) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proofs ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Cynthia Reynosa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cynthia Reynosa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Garnica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Garnica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Garnica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NH Management LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by NH Management LLC (Defendant); Moss & Company Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NH Management LLC (Defendant); Moss & Company Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Moss & Company Property Management (Cross-Complainant); NH Management LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Carlos Garnica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketOther - (Proof of Service of Summons); Filed by Carlos Garnica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Garnica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NH Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where MOSS AND CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARBER LEONARD NORMAN