This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2021 at 03:16:13 (UTC).

CARLOS FUENTES, A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP VS MARMAR BEDFORD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 CARLOS FUENTES, A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARMAR BEDFORD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1420

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLOS FUENTES A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP DBA PITUFOS CARPENTERS COMPANY

Defendants

ASSET CM CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LAPEER 160 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LENLIB LAPEER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LENMAR BEDFORD LLC AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

LENMAR CORNING LLC AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

MARMAR BEDFORD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MARMAR CORNING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLUMTREE A. MARIA

Defendant Attorneys

BERGER AARON

COSSO DENNIS

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/31/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/24/2021: Answer

General Denial

9/30/2021: General Denial

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/4/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lis Pendens

8/25/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Lis Pendens

8/25/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Lis Pendens

8/25/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Asset CM Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Marmar Bedford, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Lenmar Bedford, LLC, an unknown business entity (Defendant); Marmar Corning, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hudson Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Carlos Fuentes, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLUMTREE A. MARIA