This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 13:05:17 (UTC).

CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1288

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNIZ GONZALEZ CARLOS FEDERICO

Defendants

GARCIA GERALDINE

MALAPITAN EUNICE D.

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEECHER BRIAN G.

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH ROMAN S.

ARABI ARASH

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/12/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/12/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/12/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/12/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

3/2/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/7/2022: Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2025
  • Hearing01/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • Hearing07/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • Hearing06/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GERALDINE GARCIA (Defendant); EUNICE D. MALAPITAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CARLOS FEDERICO MUNIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN G. BEECHER