This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2022 at 10:51:42 (UTC).

CARLOS FARFAN, ET AL. VS JESUS GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 CARLOS FARFAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3419

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FARFAN CARLOS

GUZMAN BEATRIZ

Defendant

GONZALEZ JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOULAEV OLESIA

Defendant Attorney

MICHAELSON LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

12/14/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/29/2021: Complaint

Answer

3/8/2022: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

4/18/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

4/18/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/18/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2024
  • Hearing11/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Jesus Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jesus Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jesus Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jesus Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jesus Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Farfan (Plaintiff); Beatriz Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Farfan (Plaintiff); Beatriz Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Farfan (Plaintiff); Beatriz Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAELSON LINDSAY