This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2023 at 10:25:02 (UTC).

CARLOS DELGADO, ET AL. VS DOE 1, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 CARLOS DELGADO, filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DOE 1, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIVIA ROSALES and LEE W. TSAO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1753

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OLIVIA ROSALES

LEE W. TSAO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELGADO CARLOS

DOE 7085 JOHN

DOE 7086 JOHN

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ABC UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

MAESE EDUARDO GONZALEZ

Defendant and Cross Defendant

MAESE EDUARDO GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

MCCUNE DANA JOHN

Cross Defendant Attorney

MAYERS EMILY ROSE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

5/24/2023: Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/22/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 06/06/2023

6/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 06/06/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

6/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Notice of Related Case

5/31/2023: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Related Case

5/24/2023: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/10/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

5/5/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/5/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND GRANTING PERMISSION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND GRANTING PERMISSION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN O...)

2/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN O...)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION APPROVING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND GRANTING PERMISSION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO NAME DEFENDANTS

2/21/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION APPROVING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND GRANTING PERMISSION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO NAME DEFENDANTS

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • Hearing09/18/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Court Order regarding case management conference; Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/18/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 22NWCV01753, 22NWCV01445 are related; case number 22NWCV01445 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Regarding Notice of Related Case;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Regarding Notice of Related Case;) of 06/06/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/14/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff); John Doe 7085 (Plaintiff); John Doe 7086 (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff); John Doe 7085 (Plaintiff); John Doe 7086 (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Redacted Certificate of Merit re DOE 1; Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff); John Doe 7085 (Plaintiff); John Doe 7086 (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Redacted Certificate of Merit of Mental Health Professional re Carlos Delgado; Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff); John Doe 7085 (Plaintiff); John Doe 7086 (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Redacted Certificate of Merit of Mental Health Professional re JD 7086; Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff); John Doe 7085 (Plaintiff); John Doe 7086 (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff); John Doe 7085 (Plaintiff); John Doe 7086 (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Redacted Certificate of Merit re DOE 2; Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff); John Doe 7085 (Plaintiff); John Doe 7086 (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Redacted Certificate of Merit of Mental Health Professional re JD 7085; Filed by: Carlos Delgado (Plaintiff); John Doe 7085 (Plaintiff); John Doe 7086 (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant); DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less