Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 00:40:03 (UTC).

CARLOS, DAVID THOMAS VS TRONCOSO, GUILLERMO

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 CARLOS, DAVID THOMAS filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against TRONCOSO, GUILLERMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ARIAN, LEE S., CONVEY, MICHAEL J. and RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6145

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ARIAN, LEE S.

CONVEY, MICHAEL J.

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARLOS DAVID THOMAS

Respondent

TRONCOSO GUILLERMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEBEAU JEFFERY OLIVER

Respondent Attorney

RUIZ LOUIE ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

1/27/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation - STIPULATION FOR MUTUAL STAY AWAY ORDER AND ORDER

1/27/2021: Stipulation - STIPULATION FOR MUTUAL STAY AWAY ORDER AND ORDER

Substitution of Attorney

1/27/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

1/27/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/27/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/3/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/1/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

12/3/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/1/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

11/16/2020: Proof of Service

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/9/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment

11/9/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/9/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 77, Convey, Michael J., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Transfer - Different Department- This Hearing Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketStipulation (STIPULATION FOR MUTUAL STAY AWAY ORDER AND ORDER ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 25, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUIZ LOUIE ANTHONY