This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 01:17:02 (UTC).

CARLOS CORELLA, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 CARLOS CORELLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4638

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORELLA DUBELZA

CORELLA CARLOS

HANO DENISE

HANO EDWARD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S RELIEF FUND

EDISON INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

EDISON RENEWABLE ENERGY INC.

EDISON ENERGY GROUP INC.

EDISON ELECTRIC VEHICLES INC.

EDISON CAPITAL

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

EDISON MISSION ENERGY

EDISON MISSION GROUP INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Cross Defendants

PV SOUTH GATE GP LLC

PATH VILLAS SOUTH GATE LP

FISCHER SUITES INC.

PATH VENTURES METRO 345 LLC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CASTRONOVO NICOLE RACHEL

PANISH BRIAN J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ARKO RICHARD D.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

10/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

11/6/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS

1/14/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

10/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING, STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS]

10/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING, STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS]

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

10/11/2019: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/2/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/3/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/26/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

8/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Related Case

8/9/2019: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

8/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint

7/19/2019: Amended Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Hearing05/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Hearing04/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 2:05 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to Consolidate 19STCV24...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to Consolidate 19STCV24...) of 02/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Consolidate Actions); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edward Hano (Plaintiff); Denise Hano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Carlos Corella (Plaintiff); Dubelza Corella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Corella (Plaintiff); Dubelza Corella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docketamended complaint; Filed by Carlos Corella (Plaintiff); Dubelza Corella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edward Hano (Plaintiff); Denise Hano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Corella (Plaintiff); Dubelza Corella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Corella (Plaintiff); Dubelza Corella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Corella (Plaintiff); Dubelza Corella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTRONOVO NICOLE RACHEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH