This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 06:35:51 (UTC).

CARLOS CHAVEZ VS SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, A TEXAS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 CARLOS CHAVEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, A TEXAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6180

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ CARLOS

Defendants

RAMEY TIMOTHY

SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION A TEXAS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorney

HEARNE HEATHER DAWN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/17/2021

9/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/17/2021

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/7/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/02/2021

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/02/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

8/10/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

8/10/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/11/2021

8/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/11/2021

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

6/14/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Personal Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • Hearing10/07/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketat 11:10 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Status Conference (ReRemoval to Federal Court) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff); Filed by Carlos Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Plaintiff); Filed by Carlos Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Defendants); Filed by SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, a Texas corporation (Defendant); TIMOTHY RAMEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, a Texas corporation (Defendant); TIMOTHY RAMEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docketat 12:05 PM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANITZ ERIC A.