This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 12:44:06 (UTC).

CARLOS CASTILLO BY AND THROUGH PARENT, SUE RAZETTO IN INTEREST VS WILLIAM GILLESPIE, MD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 CARLOS CASTILLO BY AND THROUGH PARENT, SUE RAZETTO IN INTEREST filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WILLIAM GILLESPIE, MD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0328

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLOS CASTILLO BY AND THROUGH PARENT SUE RAZETTO IN INTEREST

Defendants

WILLIAM GILLESPIE MD

SILVERLAKE MEDICAL CENTER

INGLESIDE CAMPUS D/P OSHPD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SCHAFER TERRENCE J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

11/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

11/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

11/16/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order - Dismissal

11/16/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/19/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/14/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INITIATING THE MANDATORY MEET AND CONFER PROCESS WITH PLAINTIFF PRIOR TO THE FILING OF ANY MOTION TO

10/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INITIATING THE MANDATORY MEET AND CONFER PROCESS WITH PLAINTIFF PRIOR TO THE FILING OF ANY MOTION TO

Answer

10/25/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, WILLIAM GILLESPIE, M.D., PH.D.

10/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, WILLIAM GILLESPIE, M.D., PH.D.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/19/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by William Gillespie, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by William Gillespie, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by William Gillespie, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Castillo by and through parent, Sue Razetto in interest (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less