Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2020 at 01:52:58 (UTC).

CARLOS CABRERA VS MASTER CUTTING & ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 CARLOS CABRERA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MASTER CUTTING ENGINEERING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0949

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA CARLOS

Defendants

MASTER CUTTING & ENGINEERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MASTER CUTTING & ENGINEERING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorney

MORRIS CASEY LEE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

10/9/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

10/26/2020: Case Management Order

Answer

7/6/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Hearing04/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Master Cutting & Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Carlos Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Carlos Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Master Cutting & Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRIS CASEY LEE