This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 18:28:54 (UTC).

CARLOS ARMENTA VS ASSOCIATED CONSTRUCTION SERVICES GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 CARLOS ARMENTA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ASSOCIATED CONSTRUCTION SERVICES GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER, AUDRA MORI, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and KERRY BENSINGER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7599

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

AUDRA MORI

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

KERRY BENSINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMENTA CARLOS

Defendants

ACS GROUP

EL VALLE PLASTERING INC.

ASSOCIATED CONSTRUCTION SERVICES GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'CONNELL KENDALL K.

Defendant Attorney

SHIMKIN DAVID ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/22/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6/21/2023: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice - NOTICE OF MAILING OF WAIVED FEES

6/16/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF MAILING OF WAIVED FEES

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6/13/2023: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 06/02/2023

6/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 06/02/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

6/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

5/30/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SAN...)

3/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SAN...)

Notice of Settlement

3/28/2023: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/1/2023: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS A...)

9/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS A...)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE

9/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE

9/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CARLOS ARMENTA on 12/20/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Carlos Armenta as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: payment of waived fees scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Carlos Armenta (Plaintiff); As to: Associated Construction Services Group, Inc. (Defendant); ACS Group (Defendant); El Valle Plastering, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketNotice Of Mailing Of Waived Fees; Filed by: Carlos Armenta (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Armenta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 40, col 86] with Document:93506497

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CARLOS ARMENTA on 12/20/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Carlos Armenta, causes 0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Carlos Armenta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 5 - Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDocument:Order Forma Pauperis Filed by: Applicant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 06/03/19 at 10:00 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 06/18/19 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 12/18/20 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketDocument:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketDocument:Order-App/Waiver Court Fees & Cost Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less