This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 06:34:29 (UTC).

CARLOS ALIAGA VS HAKOB MINASYAN

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 CARLOS ALIAGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAKOB MINASYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8004

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALIAGA CARLOS

Defendant

MINASYAN HAKOB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAFFER ALAN

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN JAY T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/13/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/15/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

7/26/2019: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/31/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/23/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/23/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Carlos Aliaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Hakob Minasyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hakob Minasyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hakob Minasyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carlos Aliaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlos Aliaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Aliaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less