This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:44:15 (UTC).

CARLOS AGUAS VS HOME DEPOT U S A INC

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CARLOS AGUAS against HOME DEPOT U S A INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0699

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AGUAS CARLOS

Defendants and Respondents

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

DOES 1-50

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/3/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/3/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Other - (Letter of Transmittal-Remand to Superior Court(Civil)); Filed by Carlos Aguas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • ORDER FOR REMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ORDER FOR REMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • ANSWER OF HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carlos Aguas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Carlos Aguas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700699    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

CARLOS AGUAS,

Plaintiff,

v.

HOME DEPOT USA, INC., ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC700699

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE EAST DISTRICT, JUDGE PETER A. HERNANDEZ presiding in DEPT. O of the POMONA Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 18, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court