This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2020 at 06:14:23 (UTC).

CARLOS A ORELLANA ET AL VS WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC

Case Summary

On 06/14/2018 CARLOS A ORELLANA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9637

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

CASTILLO C. MARVIN

ORELLANA CARLOS A.

MENA RONALD

LOPEZ ROLANDO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HAYES ORTEGA & SANCHEZ LLP

HAYES DENNIS JOHN

KIERIG STEPHANIE A.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

METZGER SCOTT L. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT A WILSON

METZGER SCOTT LOUIS ESQ.

WILSON SCOTT ALLEN

WILSON ANNE K.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

8/27/2019: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

7/16/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

7/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

7/10/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE

7/10/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

7/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR DEFENDANT: WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS, INC.

7/2/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR DEFENDANT: WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS, INC.

Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT - JOINT

7/3/2019: Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT - JOINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/11/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER

3/14/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CURRENT PROCEEDINGS

3/14/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CURRENT PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Reply - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration

3/1/2019: Reply - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Opposition - Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel arbitration - Plaintiffs' Supplemental

2/1/2019: Opposition - Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel arbitration - Plaintiffs' Supplemental

Declaration - Declaration of Tracy J. Jones in support of Plaintiffs' supplemental opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/1/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Tracy J. Jones in support of Plaintiffs' supplemental opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Brief - Brief Supplemental Brief ISO Motion to Comple Arbitration and Stay Current Proceedings

2/15/2019: Brief - Brief Supplemental Brief ISO Motion to Comple Arbitration and Stay Current Proceedings

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearing01/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Statement; Filed by Wismettac Asian Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by Wismettac Asian Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Service); Filed by Wismettac Asian Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Carlos A. Orellana (Plaintiff); Ronald Mena (Plaintiff); C. Marvin Castillo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Rescheduled Status Conference); Filed by Carlos A. Orellana (Plaintiff); Ronald Mena (Plaintiff); C. Marvin Castillo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Carlos A. Orellana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:00 AM in Department 6; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketINITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM-CLASS ACTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carlos A. Orellana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos A. Orellana (Plaintiff); Ronald Mena (Plaintiff); C. Marvin Castillo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES DENNIS J. ESQ.