This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 00:15:53 (UTC).

CARLOS A JAEN VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 CARLOS A JAEN filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3240

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAEN CARLOS A.

Defendants and Respondents

MCDONNELL JIM IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY

BOARD OF SUPERVISORS FOR THE COUNTY OF

DOES 1 TO 30

LOS ANGELES CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION

HAMAL SACHI A. IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HAYES DENNIS J. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS EDWIN A.

GUTIERREZ PRECIADO & HOUSE LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/14/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/15/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply

3/11/2019: Reply

Notice of Lodging

3/5/2019: Notice of Lodging

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/7/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/29/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Minute Order

7/27/2018: Minute Order

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

7/31/2018: CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

RESPONDENT LOS ANGELES COUNTY CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION'S NOTICE OF NO BENEFICIAL INTEREST IN OUTCOME

6/11/2018: RESPONDENT LOS ANGELES COUNTY CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION'S NOTICE OF NO BENEFICIAL INTEREST IN OUTCOME

RESPONDENTS' ANSWER TO PETITIONER'S WRIT OF MANDATE [CCP ? 1094.5]

5/30/2018: RESPONDENTS' ANSWER TO PETITIONER'S WRIT OF MANDATE [CCP ? 1094.5]

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

4/20/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS

4/18/2018: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketDenying Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandate; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/15/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Petitioner Carlos Jaen's Motion on Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus); Filed by Carlos A. Jaen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing on Petitioner Carlos Jaen's Motion On Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus); Filed by Carlos A. Jaen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Docketat 09:32 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Carlos A. Jaen (Petitioner); Los Angeles, County (Defendant); Board Of Supervisors For The County Of (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES DENNIS J. ESQ.