This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2019 at 00:54:34 (UTC).

CARLO A COPPOLA VS LUXE H20, INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 CARLO A COPPOLA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LUXE H20, INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0198

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

COPPOLA CARLO A

LOS ANGELES POOL BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SO. CALIFORNIA BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LIFE WATER POOLS CO. BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LUXE H20 INCORPORATED

LOS ANGELES POOL BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SO. CALIFORNIA BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LIFE WATER POOLS CO. BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FINNERAN ADRIAN P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/21/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/21/2019: Complaint

Summons

2/21/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail

3/29/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/29/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Summons

3/29/2019: Summons

Cross-Complaint

3/29/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/29/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Affidavit

4/30/2019: Affidavit

Request for Dismissal

6/14/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/16/2019: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (As to Cross-Complaint Filed by Luxe H2O Incorporated); Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (As to Complaint Only); Filed by Carlo A Coppola (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Affidavit (of Due Diligence); Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Luxe H20, Incorporated (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Complaint for Damages; Filed by Carlo A Coppola (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carlo A Coppola (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Finneran, Adrian Paul