This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2022 at 02:13:00 (UTC).

CARLA MITCHELL VS PETCO HOLDINGS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 CARLA MITCHELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PETCO HOLDINGS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3298

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL CARLA

Defendants

1 THROUGH 10 DOES

PETCO HOLDINGS INC.

J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALINDO ALEXIS

Defendant Attorneys

HOANG RICHARD D.

DUBRAWSKI PETER ANDREW

SMITH AUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

5/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/14/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

5/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Demand for Jury Trial

5/14/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/21/2021: PI General Order

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/17/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Substitution of Attorney

5/13/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

5/9/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2024
  • Hearing04/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • Hearing06/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petco Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Petco Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Petco Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Email Address for Electronic Service); Filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carla Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carla Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carla Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carla Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carla Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETCO HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JB Hunt Transport, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALINDO ALEXIS