This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 01:47:03 (UTC).

CARL LUNDGREN VS CHOUCHANIK BALBALIAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CARL LUNDGREN against CHOUCHANIK BALBALIAN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9062

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LUNDGREN CARL

Defendants and Respondents

COTA ROSA CAMPOS

BALBALIAN CHOUCHANIK

DOES 1 TO 10

SALAS RICARDO SANTIAGO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/20/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF CARL LUNDGREN TO PROVIDE SIGNED AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASF AND PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM VA ADMINISTRATION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC

8/6/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF CARL LUNDGREN TO PROVIDE SIGNED AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASF AND PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM VA ADMINISTRATION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC

Opposition

9/7/2018: Opposition

Legacy Document

9/25/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

9/25/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE SIGNED AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE AND PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM VA ADMINISTRATION

10/1/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE SIGNED AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE AND PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM VA ADMINISTRATION

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

10/1/2018: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/1/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/20/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/7/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

DEMANI) FOR TRIAL BY JURY

2/23/2018: DEMANI) FOR TRIAL BY JURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/23/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/7/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Chouchanik Balbalian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Chouchanik Balbalian (Defendant); Krikor Balbalian (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Chouchanik Balbalian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE SIGNED AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE AND PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM VA ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Denied)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Chouchanik Balbalian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Chouchanik Balbalian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DEMANI) FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Carl Lundgren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Carl Lundgren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Carl Lundgren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC689062    Hearing Date: October 28, 2019    Dept: 2

Lundgren v. Balbalian, et al.

The Court GRANTS the motion to continue trial and all pretrial dates.  The date for the Final Status Conference is April 28, 2020.  The trial date is May 12, 2020.  All motion and discovery cut off dates are to be calculated by reference to the new trial date.  The parties are admonished that they are to treat the new trial date as a firm date and that they should not expect any further continuances. 

Moving party is ordered to give notice.