This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2022 at 18:48:10 (UTC).

CARL H. WESTCOTT VS BERNIE GUDVI

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 CARL H WESTCOTT filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against BERNIE GUDVI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN, CURTIS A. KIN, WENDY CHANG, GREGORY W. ALARCON and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9664

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

CURTIS A. KIN

WENDY CHANG

GREGORY W. ALARCON

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

WESTCOTT CARL H.

GUDVI BERNIE

WESTCOTT CARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GORDON MARCIA Z. ESQ.

GORDON MARCIA Z.

THOMAS ANDREW J.

KELLY CATALINA V.

ROWEN ERIC

ROWEN ERIC V.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/26/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/26/2022

7/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/26/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CATALINA V. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BERNIE GUDVIS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO) AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

6/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CATALINA V. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BERNIE GUDVIS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO) AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/14/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/24/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

5/24/2022: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT BERNIE GUDVIS APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF CATALINA V. KELLY

5/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT BERNIE GUDVIS APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF CATALINA V. KELLY

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/4/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CATALINA V. KELLY

2/18/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CATALINA V. KELLY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CATALINA V. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BERNIE GUDVIS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NATHANIEL SMITH

3/16/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CATALINA V. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BERNIE GUDVIS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NATHANIEL SMITH

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NATHANIEL SMITH; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/16/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NATHANIEL SMITH; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NATHANIEL SMITH

3/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NATHANIEL SMITH

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

1/13/2022: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/13/2022

1/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/13/2022

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES

11/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/26/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue Trial); Filed by Bernie Gudvi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF CATALINA V. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BERNIE GUDVIS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO) AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET THREE)); Filed by Bernie Gudvi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Bernie Gudvi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Carl H. Westcott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bernie Gudvi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carl H. Westcott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carl H. Westcott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carl H. Westcott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROWEN ERIC V.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ANDREW J.