This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 06:22:47 (UTC).

CARINA SOLARES VS CITY OF NORWALK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 CARINA SOLARES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF NORWALK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4604

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLARES CARINA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA STATE TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF NORWALK

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

GRANADOS LEXIE

HERMAN WEISSKER POWER INC.

SERRANO ADRIANA

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AKERS KRISTINA

Defendant Attorneys

BLANC CARLA M.

SOLARES ERICK LEONEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/27/2021: Answer

Answer

8/10/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

7/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

7/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/2/2021: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • Hearing12/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The People of The State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carina Solares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California State Transportation Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where HERMAN WEISSKER POWER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF NORWALK is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant